CT HB07219 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To ban guns without serial numbers and regulate those which are sold in a form requiring the purchaser to finish assembly or that are homemade or 3-D printed.
Title
An Act Concerning Ghost Guns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 207 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 9372 (Y: 9 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 208 PASS (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 75 AS AMENDED (Y: 108 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 208 PASS (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 75 AS AMENDED (Y: 108 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-05-28 | House | Public Act 19-6 |
2019-05-23 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 9372 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-09 | House | File Number 867 |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate Calendar Number 473 |
2019-05-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8074 |
2019-04-08 | House | File Number 485 |
2019-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 312 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |