CT HB07223 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require safe storage of a pistol or revolver in a motor vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Storage Of A Pistol Or Revolver In A Motor Vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 203 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8744 (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 204 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 9148 (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 205 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 8740 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 206 PASS (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 81 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 98 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 82 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 60 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 83 AS AMENDED (Y: 98 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-05-29HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-05-29HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-05-28HousePublic Act 19-7
2019-05-23HouseIn Concurrence
2019-05-23HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C,D
2019-05-23HouseSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8740
2019-05-23HouseSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 9148
2019-05-23HouseSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8744
2019-05-23HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,C,D
2019-05-10HouseFile Number 871
2019-05-10HouseSenate Calendar Number 476
2019-05-10HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-08HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C,D
2019-05-08HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule D 8223
2019-05-08HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 8187
2019-05-08HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 8162
2019-05-08HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8067
2019-04-08HouseFile Number 486
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 313
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-04HousePublic Hearing 03/11
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB07223&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-07223-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-07223-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-07223-R02-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00007-R00HB-07223-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-07223-R00JUD-CV67-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00083-R00HB07223-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00082-R00HB07223-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00081-R00HB07223-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00206-R00HB07223-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00205-R00HB07223-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00204-R00HB07223-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00203-R00HB07223-SV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback