CT HB07227 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Department of Housing to conduct a study of methods to facilitate seniors residing in their homes as long as possible.
Title
An Act Concerning Aging In Place.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | House | File Number 198 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 148 |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |