CT HB07229 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To modify existing requirements for landlords to provide notice of fire suppression systems to tenants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Fire Sprinkler Systems In Rental Units.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 326 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 49 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-19HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-19HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-13HousePublic Act 19-51
2019-06-04HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-04HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-26HouseFile Number 817
2019-04-26HouseSenate Calendar Number 425
2019-04-26HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-24HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-24HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7376
2019-03-28HouseFile Number 199
2019-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 149
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/05
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Housing

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback