CT HB07236 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Senate Calendar Number 508
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To increase the values of the motor vehicle and homestead exemptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Property That Is Exempt From A Judgment Creditor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 121 (Y: 135 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseSenate Calendar Number 508
2019-05-16HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-14HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-25HouseFile Number 782
2019-04-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 490
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-10HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback