CT HB07238 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 292
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 292
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make administrative changes to the municipal employees health insurance program.
Title
An Act Concerning Administrative Changes To The Municipal Employees Health Insurance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | File Number 292 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 200 |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |