CT HB07248 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To allow spouses and children of certain members of the armed forces to be deemed in-state students for the purposes of certain tuition charges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning In-state Student Status For Spouses And Children Of Certain Members Of The Armed Forces.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 400 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 105 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-25HousePublic Act 19-172
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed
2019-05-16HouseSenate Calendar Number 515
2019-05-16HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-14HouseHouse Passed
2019-03-28HouseFile Number 203
2019-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 153
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-13HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback