CT HB07249 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Senate Calendar Number 385
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Senate Calendar Number 385
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require emergency medical services personnel to receive training in health conditions common to former members of the armed forces.
Title
An Act Concerning Emergency Medical Training In Health Conditions Common To Former Members Of The Armed Forces.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 28 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 385 |
2019-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | House Passed |
2019-03-26 | House | File Number 153 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 117 |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |