CT HB07251 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 431
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 431
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) require electric distribution companies to solicit and file with the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority long-term contracts with owners or developers of certain Class I generation projects for an additional year, (2) increase the total potential deployment pursuant to the residential solar investment program to four hundred megawatts, and (3) require a study of the value of solar.
Title
An Act Concerning Net Metering, Long-term Contracts For Certain Class I Generation Projects, Renewable Energy Tariffs And The Residential Solar Investment Program And Requiring A Study Of The Value Of Distributed Generation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 431 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 283 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |