CT HB07260 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 298
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To exclude beer manufacturers, their employees and the dependents of their employees from various provisions of the insurance statutes concerning small employer health insurance coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Excluding Beer Manufacturers, Their Employees And The Dependents Of Their Employees From Various Provisions Of The Insurance Statutes Concerning Small Employer Health Insurance Coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 298
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 206
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback