CT HB07261 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 408
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit health insurance policies providing coverage for outpatient prescription drugs, and mental health care benefits provided under state law, with state funds or to state employees, from requiring a prescribing health care provider to prescribe an outpatient psychotropic drug in a quantity that such provider deems clinically inappropriate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Prohibiting Requirements For Prescribing Clinically Inappropriate Quantities Of Outpatient Psychotropic Drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 41 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseSenate Calendar Number 408
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-23HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-17HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17HouseNo New File by Committee on Public Health
2019-04-17HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-17HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-17HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Public Health
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 299
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 207
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/05
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback