CT HB07262 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 352
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 352
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit life insurance companies doing business in this state from requiring genetic testing, or using genetic information, in connection with life insurance policies and annuity contracts in this state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Genetic Information And Testing By Life Insurance Companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | File Number 352 |
2019-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 230 |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |