CT HB07278 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - File Number 970
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To permit the provision of mobile integrated health care in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Mobile Integrated Health Care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 154 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseFile Number 970
2019-05-22HouseSenate Calendar Number 585
2019-05-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-20HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-20HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7907
2019-04-10HouseFile Number 580
2019-04-10HouseHouse Calendar Number 353
2019-04-10HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-10HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-25HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-13HousePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback