CT HB07282 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require newborn screening for spinal muscular atrophy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Newborn Screening For Spinal Muscular Atrophy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 391 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 40 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-25HousePublic Act 19-176
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed
2019-04-25HouseSenate Calendar Number 409
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-23HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-09HouseFile Number 560
2019-04-09HouseHouse Calendar Number 342
2019-04-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-09HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-25HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/13
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback