CT HB07283 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Senate Calendar Number 675
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Department of Transportation to study issues relating to transportation in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A Study By The Department Of Transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 271 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 675
2019-06-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-01SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-01HouseOn Consent Calendar
2019-06-01HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-06-01HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 10439
2019-05-30HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-30HouseNo New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-05-30HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-30HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-29HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-24HousePublic Hearing 05/28
2019-05-22HouseReferred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-05-22HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9477
2019-04-08HouseFile Number 491
2019-04-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 318
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback