CT HB07286 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To allow certified home inspectors to inspect certain building foundations and to require appraisal management companies to compensate appraisers fairly.
Title
An Act Concerning Home Inspectors And Appraisers.
Sponsors
House General Law Committee | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] | Sen. Gennaro Bizzarro [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 416 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 204 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 204 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-25 | House | Public Act 19-183 |
2019-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-28 | House | File Number 1008 |
2019-05-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 616 |
2019-05-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-23 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-23 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8216 |
2019-04-08 | House | File Number 494 |
2019-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 321 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |