CT HB07290 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the next study of the effect of legalized gambling by October 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Studies Of Gaming In This State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 432
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 284
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback