CT HB07291 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-19-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) require the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection to update school security and safety plan standards, (2) require the department to report on and implement simplified documentation requirements for reporting by local and regional boards of education on school security and safety plans and drills, (3) require the department and the School Safety Infrastructure Council to report on and implement simplified documentation requirements for school security infrastructure grants, and (4) require the department to develop criteria to identify qualified school security consultants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning School Security.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 336 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 210 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-19HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-19HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-13HousePublic Act 19-52
2019-06-04HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-04HouseSenate Passed
2019-05-28HouseSenate Calendar Number 612
2019-05-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-23HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-23HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-23HouseNo New File by Committee on Education
2019-04-23HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-17HouseReferred by House to Committee on Education
2019-04-08HouseFile Number 496
2019-04-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 323
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback