CT HB07292 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 497
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require any person who uses the title "social worker" to be properly licensed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Social Worker Title Protection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseFile Number 497
2019-04-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 324
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-22HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-21HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback