CT HB07293 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - File Number 618
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - File Number 618
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide that the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection may issue an order requiring the execution of a contract for the redevelopment of the Connecticut Solid Waste System Project.
Title
An Act Concerning The Redevelopment Of Certain Solid Waste Management Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | File Number 618 |
2019-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 372 |
2019-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |