CT HB07301 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - File Number 971
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - File Number 971
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow the Department of Public Health to have remote access to electronic medical records of hospitals that involve reportable diseases, emergency illnesses and health conditions or reportable tumors.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendations Regarding Remote Access To Electronic Medical Records By The Department Of Public Health.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] | Sen. Patricia Miller [D] | Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 157 AS AMENDED (Y: 87 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | File Number 971 |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 586 |
2019-05-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7411 |
2019-04-10 | House | File Number 581 |
2019-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 354 |
2019-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |