CT HB07307 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters related to commerce to study tourism and its effects and impact on the state and its economy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Deposits To And Allocation Of Funds In The Tourism Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-04-03HouseFile Number 356
2019-04-03HouseHouse Calendar Number 234
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-03HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-19HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback