CT HB07313 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To codify the rights and protections afforded to homeless children and youth under the McKinney-Vento Homeless Assistance Act as it relates to students' access to education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Homeless Students' Access To Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 388 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 27 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-25HousePublic Act 19-179
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed
2019-04-22HouseSenate Calendar Number 380
2019-04-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17HouseHouse Passed
2019-03-26HouseFile Number 154
2019-03-26HouseHouse Calendar Number 118
2019-03-26HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-26HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-15HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/13
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback