CT HB07314 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - File Number 847
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - File Number 847
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure that a crime victim has participatory rights in any hearing concerning a violation of probation or conditional discharge involving the person who committed the criminal act.
Title
An Act Concerning A Crime Victim's Participatory Rights In A Violation Of Probation Or Conditional Discharge Hearing.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Stephanie Cummings [R] | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Rep. Tom O'Dea [R] |
Rep. William Petit [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | File Number 847 |
2019-04-30 | House | House Calendar Number 530 |
2019-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-21 | House | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |