CT HB07332 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 502
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the automatic transfer to criminal court of a case of a juvenile charged with larceny involving theft of a motor vehicle when the juvenile has at least four prior adjudications or convictions for a felony and to change the factors a court must consider when determining whether to transfer a case involving a juvenile charged with certain felonies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Public Safety And The Welfare Of Repeat Juvenile Offenders And Their Victims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseFile Number 502
2019-04-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 330
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback