CT HB07333 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - File Number 1027
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To make technical changes to public safety statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Criminal History Records Checks Of Volunteer Firefighters And Certain Employees Of Quasi-public Agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 238 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseFile Number 1027
2019-05-31HouseSenate Calendar Number 658
2019-05-31HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-29HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-29HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9401
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 434
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 286
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback