CT HB07334 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a Commission on Gaming and transfer oversight of gambling in this state from the Department of Consumer Protection to the commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Commission On Gaming.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-15HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-15HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-08HouseFile Number 461
2019-04-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 331
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback