CT HB07338 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase funding for elderly nutrition, ensure equitable rates for providers of meals on wheels and collect and analyze data on malnutrition.
Title
An Act Increasing Funding For Elderly Nutrition, Ensuring Equitable Rates For Providers Of Meals On Wheels And Collecting Data On Malnutrition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-08 | House | File Number 503 |
2019-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 332 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |