CT HB07340 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To codify the common law use of the instrumentality test when making determinations as to (1) the liability of the shareholders of a corporation for the act or debts of the corporation, and (2) the liability of the members or managers of a limited liability company for the debts, obligations or other liability of the limited liability company.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Use Of Veil Piercing To Determine The Personal Responsibility Of An Interest Holder Of A Domestic Entity For The Debts, Obligations Or Other Liabilities Of Such Entity And The Responsibility Of A Domestic Entity For The Debts, Obligations Or Other Liabilities Of An Interest Holder Of Such Entity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 397 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 107 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-25HousePublic Act 19-181
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-16HouseFile Number 907
2019-05-16HouseSenate Calendar Number 496
2019-05-16HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-14HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-14HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7835
2019-04-25HouseFile Number 784
2019-04-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 492
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-10HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-11HousePublic Hearing 03/15
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback