CT HB07343 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Increase the Claims Commissioner's threshold for settling claims from twenty thousand dollars to fifty thousand dollars, (2) permit the Claims Commissioner to hold hearings on liability only, (3) to permit certain medical malpractice claims to be initiated in state court instead of the Office of the Claims Commissioner, and (4) give the Claims Commissioner authority to delegate certain decision making authority to a magistrate.
Title
An Act Concerning The Office Of The Claims Commissioner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 351 PASS (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 90 AS AMENDED (Y: 103 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 90 AS AMENDED (Y: 103 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-25 | House | Public Act 19-182 |
2019-06-05 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-10 | House | File Number 872 |
2019-05-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-08 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-08 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8262 |
2019-04-25 | House | File Number 785 |
2019-04-25 | House | House Calendar Number 493 |
2019-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-11 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |