CT HB07344 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - File Number 908
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - File Number 908
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To improve a municipality's code enforcement process and reduce the rate of repeat offenders.
Title
An Act Concerning The Imposition Of Penalties For Repeated Violations Of Municipal Regulations Or Ordinances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 122 AS AMENDED (Y: 94 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | File Number 908 |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Calendar Number 497 |
2019-05-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-14 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8239 |
2019-04-29 | House | File Number 827 |
2019-04-29 | House | House Calendar Number 527 |
2019-04-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |