CT HB07349 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - File Number 1028
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To enable identity theft victims to access records in the case of identity theft that would otherwise be unavailable to the victim in the case of a defendant accessing accelerated rehabilitation for the purpose of correcting erroneous information concerning the victim's identity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Identity Theft Victim Access To Records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 243 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateFile Number 1028
2019-05-31SenateSenate Calendar Number 650
2019-05-31SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-30SenateImmediate Transmittal to the Senate
2019-05-30HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-30HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7982
2019-04-25HouseFile Number 786
2019-04-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 494
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-10HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-14HousePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback