CT HB07352 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make minor revisions and additions to the education statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Assorted Revisions And Additions To The Education Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-11 | House | File Number 623 |
2019-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 387 |
2019-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |