CT HB07359 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - File Number 972
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - File Number 972
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To build a healthier and safer environment for lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender and queer persons with the establishment of a health and human services network dedicated to their needs.
Title
An Act Concerning A Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender And Queer Health And Human Services Network.
Sponsors
House Human Services Committee | Rep. Jeffrey Currey [D] | Rep. Raghib Allie-Brennan [D] | Rep. Antonio Felipe [D] |
Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] | Rep. Kathy Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 162 AS AMENDED (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | File Number 972 |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 577 |
2019-05-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C |
2019-05-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 9117 |
2019-05-20 | House | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 9116 |
2019-05-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9091 |
2019-05-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-11 | House | File Number 627 |
2019-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 380 |
2019-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |