CT HB07372 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - File Number 788
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit driving while smoking, inhaling or ingesting a cannabis-type substance, to prohibit a passenger from smoking a cannabis-type substance and to provide funding to train law enforcement officers as drug recognition experts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Driving While Under The Influence Of An Intoxicating Drug.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseFile Number 788
2019-04-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 496
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-10HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-18HousePublic Hearing 03/22
2019-03-15HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback