CT HB07379 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the penalties associated with the issuance of a stop work order.
Title
An Act Increasing The Penalties Associated With The Issuance Of A Stop Work Order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Bill Passed Temporarily |
2019-04-30 | House | File Number 848 |
2019-04-30 | House | House Calendar Number 531 |
2019-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-29 | House | Public Hearing 04/03 |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |