CT HB07385 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - File Number 973
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - File Number 973
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To modify requirements for the affirmations, certifications and affidavits contractors are required to submit for large state contracts concerning, ethics laws, investment restrictions, consulting agreements and state contractor contribution and solicitation prohibitions.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Administrative Services And Changes To Affirmation, Affidavit And Certification Requirements For Large State Contracts.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Jonathan Steinberg [D] | Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D] | Rep. Kara Rochelle [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 158 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | File Number 973 |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 580 |
2019-05-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7656 |
2019-04-18 | House | File Number 756 |
2019-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 454 |
2019-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-21 | House | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |