CT HB07388 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - File Number 790
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - File Number 790
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure that a mortgagee does not enter upon the residential real property that is the subject of the mortgage without the permission of the owner, occupant or mortgagor or an order of a court.
Title
An Act Protecting A Mortgagor From An Unreasonable Invasion Of His Or Her Privacy By A Mortgage Holder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | File Number 790 |
2019-04-25 | House | House Calendar Number 498 |
2019-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-29 | House | Public Hearing 04/03 |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |