CT HB07395 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To add opioid antagonists to drugs monitored as part of the electronic prescription drug monitoring program, to require counseling for inmates vulnerable to opioid use disorder counseling prior to release from a correctional facility and to establish a medication-assisted treatment program in correctional facilities for inmates with opioid use disorder.
Title
An Act Concerning Opioid Abuse And Treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-29 | House | File Number 828 |
2019-04-29 | House | House Calendar Number 528 |
2019-04-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-29 | House | Public Hearing 04/03 |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |