CT HB07396 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To repeal section 53a-70b of the general statutes concerning sexual assault in a spousal or cohabitating relationship and to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Parity Between Sexual Assault In The Case Of A Spousal Or Cohabitating Relationship And Other Crimes Of Sexual Assault And Concerning The Investigation Of A Family Violence Crime.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 367 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 179 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-25HousePublic Act 19-189
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-24HouseFile Number 997
2019-05-24HouseSenate Calendar Number 603
2019-05-24HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-22HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-22HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9337
2019-04-30HouseFile Number 851
2019-04-30HouseHouse Calendar Number 534
2019-04-30HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-30HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-10HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-28HousePublic Hearing 04/01
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback