CT HB07413 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) allow certain persons to file for property tax exemptions, notwithstanding certain statutory deadlines, (2) require the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection to pay a grant-in-aid to the town of Wallingford for extension of municipal water services, (3) authorize the town of Woodbridge to renew certain temporary notes, notwithstanding the statutory renewal period, and (4) specify that a personal property declaration filing extension request be made in writing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Failure To File For Certain Grand List Exemptions, Payment Of A Grant-in-aid To The Town Of Wallingford And The Extension For Filing An Annual Declaration Of Personal Property And Validating A Tax Credit Claim.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 369 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 324 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-26SenatePublic Act 19-200
2019-06-05SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 683
2019-06-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-04SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-04HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10851
2019-05-16HouseFile Number 897
2019-05-16HouseHouse Calendar Number 603
2019-05-16HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-16HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-10HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/19 5:00 PM
2019-05-02HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-01HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-04-22HousePublic Hearing 04/26
2019-04-18HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback