CT HB07415 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Senate Calendar Number 694
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Senate Calendar Number 694
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To impose a two per cent surcharge on the net gain from the sale or exchange of capital assets for certain taxpayers.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of New Revenue Streams.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 356 AS AMENDED (Y: 85 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 694 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 11044 |
2019-05-15 | House | File Number 883 |
2019-05-15 | House | House Calendar Number 592 |
2019-05-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/14/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-30 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-04-22 | House | Public Hearing 04/26 |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |