CT HB07416 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - File Number 875
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - File Number 875
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Agriculture and the executive director of the Capital Region Development Authority to jointly study ways to encourage the renovation and expansion of the Connecticut Regional Market in Hartford.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Ways To Encourage Renovation And Expansion Of The Connecticut Regional Market In Hartford.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | File Number 875 |
2019-05-14 | House | House Calendar Number 581 |
2019-05-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/13/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-30 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-22 | House | Public Hearing 04/26 |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |