CT HJ00162 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Matt Fleury Of Hartford To Be Reappointed To The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Matt Fleury Of Hartford To Be Reappointed To The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 75 ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-04-25 | House | Senate Passed |
2019-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 382 |
2019-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | Adopted, House |
2019-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 388 |
2019-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-11 | House | Public Hearing 04/09 |