CT HR00024 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Adopted, House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Adopted, House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Proposing Approval Of An Interest Arbitration Award Between The State Of Connecticut And The Connecticut State Employees Association, Seiu Local 2001, Correction Supervisors Council, Np-8 Unit.
Title
Resolution Proposing Approval Of An Interest Arbitration Award Between The State Of Connecticut And The Connecticut State Employees Association, Seiu Local 2001, Correction Supervisors Council, Np-8 Unit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 34 (Y: 77 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Adopted, House |
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 708 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 444 |
2019-04-17 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-15 | House | House Favorable |
2019-04-08 | House | Public Hearing 04/15 |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-03 | House | Filed with House Clerks 04/01 |