CT SB00001 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 77-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a paid family and medical leave system in Connecticut.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Paid Family And Medical Leave.

Sponsors

House Labor and Public Employees Committee CommitteeSen. Martin Looney [D]Sen. Robert Duff [D]Sen. Julie Kushner [D]
Sen. Mary Daugherty Abrams [D]Sen. Alexandra Bergstein [D]Sen. Dennis Bradley [D]Sen. Stephen Cassano [D]
Sen. Christine Cohen [D]Sen. Mae Flexer [D]Sen. John Fonfara [D]Sen. Will Haskell [D]
Sen. Carlo Leone [D]Sen. Matthew Lesser [D]Sen. Douglas McCrory [D]Sen. Marilyn Moore [D]
Sen. Norman Needleman [D]Sen. Catherine Osten [D]Sen. Gary Winfield [D]Rep. Michael Winkler [D]
Rep. Peter Tercyak [D]Rep. Edwin Vargas [D]Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D]Rep. Joshua Elliott [D]
Rep. Kim Rose [D]Rep. David Michel [D]Rep. Christine Palm [D]Rep. Gregory Haddad [D]
Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D]Rep. John Hennessy [D]Rep. Julio Concepcion [D]Rep. Anne Hughes [D]
Rep. Brandon McGee [D]Rep. Russell Morin [D]Rep. Joe De la cruz [D]Rep. Rick Lopes [D]
Rep. Patricia Dillon [D]Rep. Pat Wilson Pheanious [D]Rep. Susan Johnson [D]Rep. Juan Candelaria [D]
Rep. Christopher Rosario [D]Rep. Michael D'Agostino [D]Rep. Christopher Perone [D]Sen. Derek Slap [D]
Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D]Rep. Jane Garibay [D]Rep. Quentin Phipps [D]Rep. Joshua Hall [D]
Rep. Larry Butler [D]Rep. Geoffrey Luxenberg [D]Rep. Emmett Riley [D]Rep. Robert Sanchez [D]
Rep. Antonio Felipe [D]Rep. Travis Simms [D]Rep. Bobby Gibson [D]Rep. Alphonse Paolillo [D]
Rep. Caroline Simmons [D]Rep. Christine Conley [D]Rep. Robyn Porter [D]Rep. Tom Arnone [D]
Rep. Philip Young [D]Rep. Kevin Ryan [D]Rep. Michael Dimassa [D]Rep. Gary Turco [D]
Rep. Roland Lemar [D]Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D]Rep. Matthew Ritter [D]Rep. Hilda Santiago [D]
Rep. Charlie Stallworth [D]Rep. Patricia Miller [D]Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D]Rep. Bob Godfrey [D]
Rep. Tammy Exum [D]Rep. Joseph Verrengia [D]Rep. Toni Walker [D]Sen. Saud Anwar [D]
Rep. Cristin McCarthy Vahey [D]Rep. Joseph Serra [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - House - House Roll Call Vote 258 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 61 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-31 - House - House Roll Call Vote 259 AS AMENDED (Y: 79 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 197 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 9371 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 198 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-11SenatePublic Act 19-25
2019-05-31SenateIn Concurrence
2019-05-31SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-31SenateHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 10335
2019-05-31SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-24SenateHouse Calendar Number 655
2019-05-24SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-22SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-22SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 9371
2019-05-22SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9302
2019-05-15SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-15SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-15SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13SenateJoint Favorable
2019-05-10SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-04-16SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-16SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-16SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-15SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-04SenateRules Suspended and Transmitted
2019-04-04SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-03-07SenateFile Number 35
2019-03-07SenateSenate Calendar Number 36
2019-03-07SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-07SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-20SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-19SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-02-06SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-15SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00001&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00001-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00001-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00001-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00001-R03-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00001-R04-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00025-R00SB-00001-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00001-R00LAB-CV1-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00001-R00LAB-CV72-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00001-R00FIN-CV99-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00001-R00APP-CV62-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00198-R00SB00001-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00197-R00SB00001-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00259-R00SB00001-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00258-R00SB00001-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback