CT SB00002 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - File Number 207
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - File Number 207
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide more economic security to Connecticut families by increasing the minimum fair wage.
Title
An Act Increasing The Minimum Fair Wage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | File Number 207 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 125 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |