CT SB00003 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To: (1) Enhance employer-sponsored training on sexual harassment, (2) extend the statute of limitations applicable to certain personal injury actions involving sexual abuse, sexual exploitation and sexual assault, (3) increase penalties for sexually assaulting a mentally incapacitated person, and (4) eliminate or extend the statute of limitations for the prosecution of sexual assault crimes and certain risk of injury to children offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Combatting Sexual Assault And Sexual Harassment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 272 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 36 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 273 AS AMENDED (Y: 121 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 168 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-06SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-06SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-05SenatePublic Act 19-16
2019-06-01SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-01SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-01SenateHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 10467
2019-06-01SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-17SenateHouse Calendar Number 613
2019-05-17SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-16SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-16SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8991
2019-05-15SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-15SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-15SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13SenateJoint Favorable
2019-05-10SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-30SenateFile Number 852
2019-04-30SenateSenate Calendar Number 448
2019-04-30SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-30SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-12SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-28SenatePublic Hearing 04/01
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-19SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-23SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00003&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00003-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00003-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00003-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00003-R03-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00016-R00SB-00003-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00003-R00JUD-CV8-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00003-R00JUD-CV149-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00003-R00APP-CV63-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00168-R00SB00003-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00273-R00SB00003-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00272-R00SB00003-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback