CT SB00003 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Public Hearing 03/17
Pending: Joint Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Public Hearing 03/17
Pending: Joint Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make various changes to the Office of Workforce Competitiveness, establish the Governor's Workforce Council and establish various incentives for job creation, workforce training and economic development.
Title
An Act Concerning 21st Century Jobs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |