CT SB00005 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-6-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a workforce pipeline and job creation task force to prepare the state's future workforce for well-paying manufacturing and technical jobs located in Connecticut.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Workforce Pipeline And Job Creation Task Force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - House - House Roll Call Vote 256 AS AMENDED (Y: 109 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 72 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-06SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-06SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-05SenateSpecial Act 19-6
2019-05-31SenateIn Concurrence
2019-05-31SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-31SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-26SenateHouse Calendar Number 501
2019-04-26SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-24SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-24SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-24SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7467
2019-04-04SenateFile Number 437
2019-04-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 217
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-04SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-20SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-08SenatePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-03-01SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-29SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback